Senate | 06/05/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | referred to judiciary | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1630 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 2355A | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1082 |