Senate | 05/29/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A589A | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1383 | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1021 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 2363A | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |