Senate | 10/25/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.583 | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.712 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | substituted for a6049 | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.382 |