Senate | 11/11/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.450 | ||
Senate | 11/08/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.434 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | substituted for a4613c | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1632 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 2413C | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1630 | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 2413B | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 2413A |