Assembly | 03/26/2024 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.396 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.229 |