Senate | 02/21/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 2422B | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | HOME RULE REQUEST | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2422A | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.271 |