Senate | 03/04/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | referred to transportation | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.318 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.272 |