Assembly | 05/30/2024 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | AMENDED 2440B | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1036 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1631 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/03/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 2440A | ||
Senate | 06/03/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |