Senate | 06/04/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A6957A | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1073 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 2464B | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 2464A |