Senate | 06/03/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A1696C | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1633 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 2465C | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 2465B | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 2465A | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1463 |