Assembly | 03/21/2024 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.604 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.337 |