Senate | 02/06/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 2474B | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2474A | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.233 |