LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S02494
Action History
NY
New York Senate Bill S02494
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill S02494
Action History
Senate
03/13/2023
SUBSTITUTED BY A3534
Senate
02/15/2023
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Senate
02/14/2023
2ND REPORT CAL.
Senate
02/13/2023
1ST REPORT CAL.343
Senate
01/20/2023
REFERRED TO DISABILITIES