Senate | 09/15/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.427 | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.809 | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | substituted for a3316b | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2500B | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2500A | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.306 | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |