Senate | 12/22/2023 | APPROVAL MEMO.79 | ||
Senate | 12/22/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.757 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.731 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | substituted for a7164 | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | referred to real property taxation | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.551 | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |