Senate | 12/22/2023 | APPROVAL MEMO.80 | ||
Senate | 12/22/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.758 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | ordered to third reading cal.190 | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | substituted for a133 | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.405 | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |