Senate | 12/21/2024 | VETOED MEMO.129 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.336 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | substituted for a8999c | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | referred to banks | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2601B | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.124 | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 2601A | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |