Senate | 11/22/2024 | VETOED MEMO.53 | ||
Senate | 11/15/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.45 | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | substituted for a5367b | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.266 | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 2623A | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2023 | referred to consumer affairs and protection | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.234 |