Senate | 12/21/2024 | APPROVAL MEMO.78 | ||
Senate | 12/21/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.647 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.332 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | substituted for a8872a | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | referred to codes | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2659B | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1562 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | referred to science and technology | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.735 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 2659A | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |