Senate | 06/30/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.171 | ||
Senate | 06/29/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.825 | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | substituted for a6347b | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | referred to insurance | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2679B | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1180 | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 2679A | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |