Senate | 01/22/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 2680A | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1181 |