Senate | 05/07/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 2689C | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 2689B | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 2689A | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |