Assembly | 05/16/2024 | referred to local governments | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.468 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |