Senate | 01/23/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to education | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1023 |