Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1007 |