Assembly | 05/28/2024 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.592 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1083 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | REFERENCE CHANGED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |