Senate | 05/30/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A8275A | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.793 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 2739A | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |