Assembly | 06/07/2024 | referred to codes | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1687 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/02/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 2754A | ||
Senate | 06/02/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |