Assembly | 03/26/2024 | referred to cities | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.305 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1670 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/03/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 2773B | ||
Senate | 06/03/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES 1 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 2773A | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES 1 |