Senate | 05/21/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1167 | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 2776A | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.521 |