LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S02779
Action History
NY
New York Senate Bill S02779
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill S02779
Action History
Senate
05/22/2023
SUBSTITUTED BY A3528
Senate
05/10/2023
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Senate
05/09/2023
2ND REPORT CAL.
Senate
05/08/2023
1ST REPORT CAL.752
Senate
01/24/2023
REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING