Senate | 05/08/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | referred to transportation | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.794 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.439 |