Senate | 09/06/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.353 | ||
Senate | 09/05/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.668 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | substituted for a154a | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | referred to codes | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2832A | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.566 |