Senate | 08/18/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.226 | ||
Senate | 08/16/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.557 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a3132a | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.703 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.696 | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 2852A | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |