Senate | 09/27/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.372 | ||
Senate | 09/20/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.147 | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | substituted for a2121a | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2862A | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | referred to real property taxation | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.86 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.308 |