Senate | 12/21/2024 | APPROVAL MEMO.80 | ||
Senate | 12/21/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.649 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.319 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | substituted for a7369 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2024 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.448 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.384 |