Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1300 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 2877A | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO BANKS |