Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1025 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 2913A | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |