Assembly | 03/27/2024 | referred to energy | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.690 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 2935D | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2935C | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2935B | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2935A | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.237 |