Senate | 12/22/2023 | VETOED MEMO.132 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.863 | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2023 | substituted for a4047b | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | referred to housing | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2943B | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.746 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 2943A | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | REFERENCE CHANGED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |