Senate | 09/11/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.364 | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.666 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | substituted for a75b | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1634 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 2946B | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO LABOR | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 2946A | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |