Senate | 10/23/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.535 | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.865 | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2023 | substituted for a6655a | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | referred to housing | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1801 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 2985C | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 2985B | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 2985A | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |