Senate | 11/17/2023 | VETOED MEMO.74 | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.487 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | substituted for a2252 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | referred to transportation | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1274 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |