Senate | 05/28/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | referred to education | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.203 | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.293 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 3057A | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |