Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.547 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CODES | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.469 |