Senate | 12/13/2024 | VETOED MEMO.97 | ||
Senate | 12/02/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.65 | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | substituted for a1577a | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2024 | referred to people with disabilities | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.482 | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 3108A | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO DISABILITIES | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |