Senate | 12/17/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.599 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.589 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a1588a | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1386 | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE USE DISORDERS | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 3112A | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE USE DISORDERS |