Senate | 04/09/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2024 | referred to labor | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.701 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1084 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 3117A | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |