LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S03129
Action History
NY
New York Senate Bill S03129
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill S03129
Action History
Senate
01/03/2024
REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Senate
06/10/2023
COMMITTED TO RULES
Senate
03/23/2023
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Senate
03/22/2023
2ND REPORT CAL.
Senate
03/21/2023
1ST REPORT CAL.533