Senate | 06/06/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1828 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to governmental employees | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 3144E | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | AMENDED BY RESTORING TO PREVIOUS PRINT 3144C | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1740 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 3144D | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 3144C | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 3144B | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | AMEND BY RESTORING TO ORIGINAL PRINT 3144 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 3144A |